Freeman, Risa Fern (CPSO#: 59782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 330
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-7533
Fax: (416) 497-4793
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RISA FERN FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989