Fregeau, Benjamin Michael (CPSO#: 103070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN MICHAEL FREGEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREGEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2016