Fregonas, Claudio Giovanni (CPSO#: 61327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7424
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudio Fregonas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2004

Dr. C. Fregonas ( CPSO# 61327 )

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton


Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. CLAUDIO GIOVANNI FREGONAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREGONAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1990