Freiberg, Arnis (CPSO#: 18378)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: Freibergs, Arnis (used until: 18 Aug 1996 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Fenn Ave
Toronto ON  M2P 1Y1
Phone: (416) 730-0142
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: 201 Fenn Avenue Toronto ON M2P 1Y1
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018