Freiman, Anatoli (CPSO#: 82004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:McGill University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone: (416) 633-0001
Fax: (416) 633-0002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Freiman ( CPSO# 82004 )

Business Address:
Toronto Dermatology Centre
400 - 4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone Number: (416) 633-0001


Corporation Name: Barankin & Freiman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Barankin ( CPSO# 78418 )
Dr. A. Freiman ( CPSO# 82004 )

Business Address:
Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M3H 5Y8
Phone Number: (416) 633-0001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANATOLI FREIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007