Freitag, Andreas Philip (CPSO#: 55335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Site 3V41
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76216
Fax: (905) 521-5073
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 304
216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Canada
Phone: (519) 428-1243
Fax: (519) 428-2445
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.P. Freitag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Freitag ( CPSO# 55335 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
HSC-3V41
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREAS PHILIP FREITAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREITAG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1988