Freitas, Vivianne Aguilera Rolim De (CPSO#: 96464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2017

Expiry Date:  17 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Do Estado Do Rio De Janeiro, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
University Health Network
Princess Maragret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivianne Freitas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Freitas ( CPSO# 96464 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 07 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vivianne Aguilera Rolim De Freitas may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr. Freitas holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Freitas no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Freitas' clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Freitas' certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on May 26, 2017, and currently  has an interim
                  expiry date of January 17, 2020.  The expiry date of this certificate may
                  be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.