Frelick, Linden Frederick (CPSO#: 20495)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Aug 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 1996

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1966
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Aug 1996

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Aug 1996
Summary:

 On August 15, 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Frelick guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in s. 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970, in that he had been guilty of misconduct in a 
 professional respect or of conduct unbecoming a medical practitioner or of incompetence.  Dr. 
 Frelick was also found guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 548/90, 
 in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 29(22); 
 in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to s. 29(30); and in that he 
 engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 29(33).

The Committee further found Dr. Frelick incompetent, as 
 defined in s. 61(4) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, in that he displayed in his professional 
 care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or disregard for the welfare of the 
 patient, of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in 
 practice.

Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1.	A reprimand, with the 
 fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register;
2.	Revocation of Dr. Frelick(s certificate 
 of registration; and
3.	A fine of $5,000.00 to be paid forthwith.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 12, 1996