French, Geoffrey Ronald (CPSO#: 21916)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Geoffrey French Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage and Retrieval Services 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015