Frendo, Jennifer Silvestra (CPSO#: 79837)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Primary Health Care Clinic
P O Box 1360
176 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0
Phone: (905) 468-9189
Fax: (905) 468-4947
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer S. Frendo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Frendo ( CPSO# 79837 )

Business Address:
Niagara Primary Health Care Clinic
P O Box 1360
176 Wellington Street
Niagara-on-the-lake ON  L0S 1J0
Phone Number: (905) 468-9189

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER SILVESTRA FRENDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRENDO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2005