Frendo, Marion (CPSO#: 50595)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Maltese

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jan 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 31, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective January 31, 2012, Dr. Marion Frendo has resigned from the College and agreed to never apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction.