Frenkel, Vivien Joyce (CPSO#: 51928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1985

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Pathology And
Laboratory Medicine
Queensway Carleton Hospital-EORLA
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-7878 Ext. 1018
Fax: (613) 721-4793
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivien J. Frenkel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Frenkel ( CPSO# 51928 )

Business Address:
Department Of Pathology And
Laboratory Medicine
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 612-3703

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 3, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On March 17, 2017, Queensway Carleton Hospital notified the College that Dr. Vivien Joyce Frenkel, on March 3, 2017, had voluntarily restricted her practice to exclude cytology services following an internal quality review.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 08 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIEN JOYCE FRENKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRENKEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1985