Frenklah, Yuri (CPSO#: 87457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
840 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 463-1864
Fax: (647) 933-1151
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frenklah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Frenklah ( CPSO# 87457 )

Business Address:
207 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 463-1804

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YURI FRENKLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRENKLAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2007 to 01 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Nov 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2013