Fretts, Ruth Cecilia (CPSO#: 60587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Mar 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Harvard Vanguard Medical
Association
230 Worcester Street
Wellesley MA  02481
United States
Phone: (781) 431-5229

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH CECILIA FRETTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRETTS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Mar 1990 to 04 May 1990
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1989