Frey, Benicio Noronha (CPSO#: 88029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jan 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Womens Health Concerns Clinic,
Department of Psychiatry and
Behavioural Neurosciences
100 West 5th Street, Room C124
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33605
Fax: 905-381-5629
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Frey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Frey ( CPSO# 88029 )

Business Address:
100 West 5th Street
Suite C-124
Hamilton ON  L9C 3N6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Jan 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 16 Jan 2008 to 03 Apr 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 04 Apr 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Benicio Noronha Frey may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,   Department of
                        Psychiatry  and Behavioural Neurosciences, McMaster University,  in
                        which Dr. Frey  holds  an  academic  appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Frey no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.