Friborg, Jeppe Tang (CPSO#: 96695)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Odense, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 28 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012