Fricker, Kevin Daryl (CPSO#: 101519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1950 Algonquin Ave
Suite 205
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 478-8080
Fax: 705 478-9090
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

239 Main St E
Suite 102
North Bay ON  P1B 1B2
Canada
Phone: 705 478-7197
Fax: 705 478-0861
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

66 Main St
Latchford ON  P0J 1N0
Canada
Phone: 705 676-2200
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Street
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Canada
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Fricker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fricker ( CPSO# 101519)

Business Address:
1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 205
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone Number: (705) 478-8080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN DARYL FRICKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRICKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2016