Fridman, Sebastian (CPSO#: 109982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 17 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC London Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32761
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Argentina

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN FRIDMAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. FRIDMAN is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. FRIDMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FRIDMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FRIDMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. FRIDMAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. FRIDMAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Aug 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018