Fried, Joseph Andreas (CPSO#: 51690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Community Medical Centre
1000 Upper Gage Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8V 4R5
Phone: (905) 575-4400
Electoral District: 04

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 23, 2016, Dr. Fried has obtained an acceptable Clinical
            Supervisor and therefore is allowed to issue new prescriptions or renew
            existing prescriptions for controlled substances, including narcotic drugs,
            narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted
            substances and all other monitored drugs.

            As from August 5, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joseph Andreas Fried,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fried to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                               DR. FRIED
                                             ("Dr. Fried")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Fried, certificate of registration number 51690, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214509 (the "Investigation") into whether I, in my
                  general medicine practice, including prescribing narcotics, engaged in
                  professional misconduct or am incompetent.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for at least six (6) months ("Clinical
                        Supervision").  Clinical Supervision shall cease only upon approval
                        from the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s).  The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me once every month;
                  
                        (ii)  Review, once every month, at least ten (10) to twenty (20) of
                              my patient charts selected from the Prescribing Log I am
                              required to maintain under section (6) below;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (v)   Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vi)  Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) the areas of concern
                        identified in the report of the medical inspector dated January 2,
                        2016, and any concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake to ensure that Schedule "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Fried, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will, until such time as I have obtained a Clinical
                        Supervisor acceptable to the College:
                  
                        (i)   Undertake and agree that I will not issue new prescriptions
                              or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following
                              substances:
                  
                              i.    Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                                    made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act,
                                    S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              ii.   Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                              iii.  Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                                    Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985,
                                    c. F-27); 
                  
                              iv.   Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                                    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and
                                    Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                  
                              (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                              Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached
                              hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are
                              attached hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                              v.    All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the
                                    Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c.
                                    22 as noted in Schedule "D");
                  
                              and as amended from time to time.
                  
                        (ii)  Undertake that I will return any supplies of the substances
                              referred to in section (5)(g)(I) above that are presently in
                              my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and
                              secure manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number
                              8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."
                  
                        (iii) Undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) of
                              all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                              location, in the form set out at Schedule "E".  For further
                              clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Fried must not prescribe any of the following: 
                                    -Narcotic Drugs
                                    -Narcotic Preparations
                                    -Controlled Drugs
                                    -Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    -All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                              Further information may be found on the College of Physicians
                              and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca 
                  
                        (iv)  Undertake to post a certified translation in any language in
                              which I provide services, of the sign described in section
                              (5)(g)(iii) above, in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
                              Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the
                              form set out at Schedule "E." 
                  
                        (v)   Undertake to provide the certified translation(s) described
                              in section (5)(g)(iv), to the College within thirty (30) days
                              of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                        (vi)  Undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                              Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                              will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                        (vii) Undertake to provide to the College the certified
                              translation(s) described in section (5)(g)(v) prior to
                              beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in
                              section (5)(g)(vi).
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Fried, agree that if I am required to resign my prescribing
                        privileges as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute
                        a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration
                        and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the
                        public register, as follows:
                  
                              Dr. Fried was the subject of a College investigation into
                              whether he into whether he, in his general medicine practice,
                              including prescribing narcotics, engaged in professional
                              misconduct or am incompetent..  As a result of the
                              investigation: 
                  
                              Dr. Fried must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                              prescriptions for any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                  
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                  
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                  
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);        
                  
                  and as amended from time to time.
                  
                  Dr. Fried must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all
                  his/her Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                              Dr. Fried must not prescribe any of the following: 
                                    -Narcotic Drugs
                                    -Narcotic Preparations
                                    -Controlled Drugs
                                    -Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    -All other Monitored Drugs
                  
            Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
            Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

            (6)   Prescribing Log

                  (i)   I, Dr. Fried, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored
                        Drugs (the "Prescribing Log") in the form set out at Schedule "F",
                        which will include at least the following information:  
                  
                        (i)   the date of the prescription;
                  
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                  
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed;
                  
                        (iv)  the medication dosage;
                  
                        (v)   the quantity prescribed;
                  
                        (vi)  the clinical indication for use and patient direction; and 
                  
                        (vii) physician initials.
                  
                  
                  (j)   I, Dr. Fried, shall keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                        all Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored
                        Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   Review the Canadian Guidelines for Safe and Effective Opioids
                              for Chronic and Non-Cancer Pain;
                  
                        (ii)  Prepare a written summary of the  Canadian Guidelines for
                              Safe and Effective Opioids for Chronic and Non-Cancer Pain as
                              they pertain to my practice and submit it to my Clinical
                              Supervisor;
                  
                        (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (7)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (7)(a).
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake to complete this requirement by the first
                        meeting with my Clinical Supervisor.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Schedule "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of
                        my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors
                        selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and
                        agree that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                        feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                        College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fried, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Fried, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (8)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within
                        fifteen (15) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fried, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fried, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Fried, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.  I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Fried, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Fried was the subject of a College investigation into whether
                        he, in his general medicine practice, including prescribing
                        narcotics, engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent.
                        As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              Dr. Fried will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months.
                  
                              Dr. Fried will engage in professional education in Review the
                              Canadian Guidelines for Safe and Effective Opioids for
                              Chronic and Non-Cancer Pain and prepare a written summary
                              thereof as they pertain to his practice.
                  
                              Dr. Fried's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of
                              the period of Clinical Supervision.
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Fried, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (7) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Fried, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any Practice Location
                  ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any
                  information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering
                  into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring
                  of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Fried, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (7) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (7) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joseph Andreas Fried to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 5, 2016:

Dr. Fried was the subject of a College investigation into whether he, in his general medicine practice, including prescribing narcotics, engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Fried will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for six (6) months.

Dr. Fried will engage in professional education in Review the Canadian Guidelines for Safe and Effective Opioids for Chronic and Non-Cancer Pain and prepare a written summary thereof as they pertain to his practice.

Dr. Fried’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.