Fried, Peter Ivan (CPSO#: 25751)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 27 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Fried Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fried ( CPSO# 25751 )

Business Address:
3600 Yonge Street
Suite 332
Toronto ON  M4N 3R8
Phone Number: (416) 733-3038

Business Address:
28 Main Street North
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3Z7
Phone Number: (905) 895-3840

Medical Records Location

Address: 28 Main Street North Newmarket ON L3Y 8C3
Date Received: 27 Sep 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Sep 2017