Friedberg, Mark Kevin (CPSO#: 85487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Aug 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7239
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 16 Feb 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 03 Aug 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Mark  Kevin  Friedberg  may  practise medicine independently in paediatric
            cardiology.