Friedland, Rodney (CPSO#: 67687)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008