Friedman, Esti (CPSO#: 56760)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Queens Plate Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 0B4
Phone: (416) 741-5094
Fax: (416) 741-9114
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESTI FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1987