Friedman, Gerald (CPSO#: 59934)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7330 Yonge Street
Suite 219
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 764-5590
Fax: (905) 764-6615
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Children's Treatment Network
13175 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 0G6
Canada
Phone: (866) 481-2607
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-2310
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerald Friedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Friedman ( CPSO# 59934 )

Business Address:
219 - 7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone Number: (905) 764-5590

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2310

Business Address:
13175 Yonge Street
Oak Ridges ON  L4E 0G6
Phone Number: (905) 954-4011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1989