Friedman, Nir David (CPSO#: 110320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Paediatric
Emergency Medicine
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5802
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIR DAVID FRIEDMAN may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. FRIEDMAN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FRIEDMAN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FRIEDMAN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. FRIEDMAN ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. FRIEDMAN ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018