Friedman, Steven Marc (CPSO#: 62378)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
RFE G-S434
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M. Friedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Friedman ( CPSO# 62378 )

Business Address:
UHN - TGH & TWH
RFE GS-434
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN MARC FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991