Friedman, Yael (CPSO#: 79411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Oak Medical
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 582-7533
Fax: (905) 582-0766
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yael Friedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Friedman ( CPSO# 79411 )

Business Address:
West Oak Medical
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-7533

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAEL FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008