Friedman, Zeev Zvulun (CPSO#: 76896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Mar 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue Room 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

340 College
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Z. Friedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Friedman ( CPSO# 76896 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
Room 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 May 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 01 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Zeev   Zvulun   Friedman   may   practise   medicine   independently   in
            Anaesthesiology, only.