Friefeld, Joanne Minda (CPSO#: 51411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone: (905) 457-8428
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kaizer & Friefeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kaizer ( CPSO# 51416 )
Dr. J. Friefeld ( CPSO# 51411 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
307 - 164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 457-8428

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE MINDA FRIEFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEFELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1983