Friesen, Reinhard Heinrich (CPSO#: 32192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5 555 George St. N
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone: (705) 742-0443
Fax: 705 742 5569
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prhc
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9H 7V6
Canada
Phone: (705) 876-5022
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.H. Friesen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Friesen ( CPSO# 32192 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
572 Weller Street
Suite 5
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone Number: (705) 742-3935

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Uganda

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REINHARD HEINRICH FRIESEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIESEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1981