Frith, Russell Harold (CPSO#: 29078)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Jun 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Jun 2002
Summary:

 On June 28, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, 
 having found Dr. Russell Harold Frith guilty of professional misconduct in that he engaged in the 
 sexual abuse of a patient contrary to s.51(1)(b.1) of the Code, the Committee makes the following 
 order as to the penalty and costs.  The Discipline Committee orders and directs:

1.	Dr. Frith to 
 appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the reprimand to be recorded.

2.	The Registrar 
 to revoke Dr. Frith(s certificate of registration effective immediately.

3.	Dr. Frith to 
 reimburse the College for funding provided for the patient under the program required under s.85.7 
 of the Code.

4.	Dr. Frith to post security by way of an irrevocable letter of credit in the 
 amount of $10,000.00 to guarantee the payment of any amounts Dr. Frith maybe required to reimburse 
 the College under the order made in paragraph 3; and

5.	Dr. Frith pay to the College costs in the 
 amount of $2,500.00 within 60 days of June 28, 2002.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 05 Sep 2002
Hearing Date(s): Jun 28, 2002