Frizzle, Tena Ann (CPSO#: 72247)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: MacArthur, Tena Ann (used until: 19 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2000 to 19 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2000