Frobb, Devin Gregory (CPSO#: 102172)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2013 to 01 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - General Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2014 to 07 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2014