From, Lynn (CPSO#: 19518)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CML Healthcare Inc. Histology Department 6560 Kennedy Road Mississauga, ON L5T 2X4; Women's College Hospital Division Of Dermatology 76 Grenville Street Toronto, ON M5S 1B2; Toronto Sunnybrook Regional Cancer Centre 2075 Bayview Avenue Toronto, ON M4N 3M5
Instructions: Medical records are located at Sunnybrook Hospital, Women's College Hospital and CML Healthcare Inc.
Date Received: 13 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014