Frost, Joseph Brian (CPSO#: 41353)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2002