Frost, Peter Graham (CPSO#: 23327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Ovida Boulevard
Markham ON  L3P 7N8
Phone: (905) 471-2337
Fax: (905) 471-2337
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

brooklin med centre
5959 anderson st
Brooklin ON  L1M 2E9
Canada
Phone: (905) 655-3321
Fax: (905) 655-4848
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Brooklin Medical Centre
Suite 1A
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin ON  L1M 3E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Frost Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 1 2017


Corporation Name: P. Frost, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 2 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GRAHAM FROST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FROST is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1970