Froud, Peter John (CPSO#: 42298)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Froud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 6 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1999
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010