Fruchter, Lauren Lidia (CPSO#: 105871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Ave
E-Main, Room EM-206
Box 22
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798 5555 Ext. 18578
Fax: (613) 761 5488
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN LIDIA FRUCHTER shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FRUCHTER is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. FRUCHTER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FRUCHTER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FRUCHTER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FRUCHTER is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FRUCHTER no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018