Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fruetel, Karen (CPSO#: 55546)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014