Fry, Joanne Lisa (CPSO#: 73775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hugh Allen Clinic
P O Box 489
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1A8
Phone: (807) 737-3803
Fax: (807) 737-1771
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joanne L. Fry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fry ( CPSO# 73775 )

Business Address:
The Hugh Allen Clinic
79 Fifth Avenue North
PO Box 489
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1A8
Phone Number: (807) 737-3803

Business Address:
47B Front Street
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1A3
Phone Number: (807) 737-2292

Business Address:
75 Fifth Avenue
Box 909
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-1364

Business Address:
1 Meno-Ya-Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNE LISA FRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 18 Nov 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001