Fry, Margaret Alice (CPSO#: 52385)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Names: Anglin, Margaret Alice (used until: 19 Sep 1988 )     Pistone, Margaret Alice (used until: 13 Sep 1987 )     Cudmore, Margaret Alice (used until: 01 Aug 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Pl Toronto ON
Instructions: 1-800-775-0093 or www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017