Fryer, Karen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 59624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
von sakura House
715180 oxford rd 4
Woodstock ON  N4S 7V9
Phone: (519) 537-8515 Ext. ext 5
Fax: (519) 421-1057
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A1
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph E. Brioux and Dr. Karen E. Fryer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fryer ( CPSO# 59624 )
Dr. J. Brioux ( CPSO# 59765 )

Business Address:
203 - 600 Princess Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 4H4
Phone Number: (519) 421-7252

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A2
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
Sakura House
715180 Oxford Road 4
RR # 5
Woodstock ON  N4S 7V9
Phone Number: (519) 537-8515

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH FRYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRYER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989