Fu, Anna (CPSO#: 71418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-6200
Fax: (905) 471-6103
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

381 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1R5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Fu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fu ( CPSO# 71418 )

Business Address:
212 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-6200

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
4 Campbell Drive
Uxbridge ON  L9P 1S4
Phone Number: (905) 852-9771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA FU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001