Fu, Joseph Shiu-Luen (CPSO#: 65397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lifesource Health Centre
2130 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 5Z1
Phone: (613) 828-3122
Fax: (613) 828-2010
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

110-1861 Robertson Rd
Ottawa ON  K2H 9N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-3937
Fax: (613) 721-8527
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH SHIU-LUEN FU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993