Fuca, Roland Pascal Joseph (CPSO#: 43334)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roland Fuca Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 412 1230 Old Innes Road Ottawa ON K1B 3V3
Date Received: 10 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016