Fuchs, Marnie Rachel (CPSO#: 69104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 7628
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fuchs ( CPSO# 69104 )
Dr. S. Lewis ( CPSO# 62300 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
EWI-442 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5851

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Suite S-107
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARNIE RACHEL FUCHS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUCHS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2001