Fugere, Christina Michelle (CPSO#: 71132)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-7757
Fax: (905) 575-7831
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Fugere Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fugere ( CPSO# 71132 )

Business Address:
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-7757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MICHELLE FUGERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUGERE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1999