Fugere, Francois (CPSO#: 63104)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Maisonneuve-Rosemont
5415 Boul L'Assomption
Montreal QC  H1T 2M4
Phone: (514) 252-3426
Fax: (514) 412-7132

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Pain Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS FUGERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUGERE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1991