Fukar, Lenka (CPSO#: 61663)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:J.E. Purkyne University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004