Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fulgosi, Zoran (CPSO#: 23869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Addiction Centre Toronto
1288 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1M6
Phone: (416) 462-0228
Fax: (416) 461-7690
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZORAN FULGOSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FULGOSI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1971